US SB2369 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 728.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 728.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Whaling Convention Amendments Act of 2018 This bill amends the Whaling Convention Act of 1949 to require the Department of Commerce to authorize aboriginal subsistence whaling if the whaling: (1) is for subsistence purposes, including the sale of authentic native articles of handicrafts and clothing; (2) does not include the striking, taking, or killing of calves or a whale accompanied by a calf; and (3) is not accomplished in a wasteful manner. Commerce must establish catch limits for subsistence whaling by Alaska Natives if: (1) the International Whaling Commission (IWC) fails to establish the limits, and (2) Commerce determines that subsistence whaling is sustainable based on IWC's most recent review of the status of the affected whale.
Title
Whaling Convention Amendments Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 728. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. With written report No. 115-425. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5064 (Related) 2018-02-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.