US SB2368 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-203.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-203.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Atomic Energy Act of 1954 and the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to support licensing and relicensing of certain nuclear facilities and nuclear energy research, demonstration, and development, and for other purposes.
Title
Nuclear Energy Renewal Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-203. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 353. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report. |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Arms control and nonproliferation
Chemistry
Electric power generation and transmission
Employment and training programs
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Higher education
International organizations and cooperation
Licensing and registrations
Nuclear power
Radioactive wastes and releases
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Student aid and college costs
Technology assessment
Arms control and nonproliferation
Chemistry
Electric power generation and transmission
Employment and training programs
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Higher education
International organizations and cooperation
Licensing and registrations
Nuclear power
Radioactive wastes and releases
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Student aid and college costs
Technology assessment