US SB2354 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to improve access to healthy foods, food processing, housing, forestry, agricultural research, and other agricultural programs, and Tribal self-determination relating to those programs, in the State of Alaska, and for other purposes.
Title
Improving Agriculture, Research, Cultivation, Timber, and Indigenous Commodities (ARCTIC) Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4940 (Related) 2023-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities, Risk Management, and Credit.
SB2182 (Related) 2023-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB1756 (Related) 2023-05-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB1780 (Related) 2023-05-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
SB2489 (Related) 2023-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
SB2182 (Related) 2023-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB1756 (Related) 2023-05-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB1780 (Related) 2023-05-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
SB2489 (Related) 2023-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/2354/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s2354/BILLS-118s2354is.pdf |