US SB2321 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Sec. 3) directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue up to 50,000 $5 gold coins, 400,000 $1 silver coins, and 400,000 half-dollar clad coins in commemoration of the 100th anniversary of the establishment of the Negro National League, a professional baseball league that was formed in response to African-American players being banned from baseball's major leagues. (Sec. 4) The design of the coins shall be emblematic of the Negro Leagues Baseball Museum and its mission to promote tolerance, diversity, and inclusion. (Sec. 7) All surcharges from sales of these coins shall be paid to the Negro Leagues Baseball Museum for educational and outreach programs and exhibits.
Title
Negro Leagues Baseball Centennial Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-03-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1613) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | S.Amdt.1523 Amendment SA 1523 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | S.Amdt.1523 Amendment SA 1523 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Blunt. (consideration: CR S1612-1613; text: CR S1613) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1612-1613) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4104 (Related) 2020-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-209. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Athletes
Commemorative events and holidays
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Minority employment
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Professional sports
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Minority employment
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Professional sports
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history