US HB4104 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 217-85)
Status: Passed on December 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-209. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 217-85)
Status: Passed on December 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-209. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue up to 50,000 $5 gold coins, 400,000 $1 silver coins, and 400,000 half-dollar clad coins in commemoration of the 100th anniversary of the establishment of the Negro National League, a professional baseball league that was formed in response to African-American players being banned from baseball's major leagues. The design of the coins shall be emblematic of the Negro Leagues Baseball Museum and its mission to promote tolerance, diversity, and inclusion. Only during a one-year period beginning on January 1, 2022, may Treasury issue coins minted under this bill. All surcharges from sales of these coins shall be paid to the Negro Leagues Baseball Museum to fund educational and outreach programs and exhibits. Treasury shall develop and execute a marketing, advertising, promotional, and educational program to promote the collecting of these coins.
Title
Negro Leagues Baseball Centennial Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-209. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-04 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-11-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6693) |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2020-09-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-22 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H4710) |
2020-09-22 | House | H.Amdt.886 On agreeing to the Cleaver amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-22 | House | H.Amdt.886 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Cleaver. (consideration: CR H4709-4711; text: CR H4710) |
2020-09-22 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4709-4711) |
2020-09-22 | House | Committee on Financial Services discharged. |
2020-09-22 | House | Mr. Cleaver asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2019-07-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-07-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2321 (Related) 2020-03-09 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Athletes
Commemorative events and holidays
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Minority employment
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Professional sports
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Minority employment
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Professional sports
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history