US SB2315 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 413.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 413.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Over-the-Counter Drug Safety, Innovation, and Reform Act
Title
Over-the-Counter Drug Safety, Innovation, and Reform Act
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 413. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5333 (Related) 2018-07-17 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 518.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Child health
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Government information and archives
Health
Judicial review and appeals
User charges and fees
Child health
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Government information and archives
Health
Judicial review and appeals
User charges and fees