US HB5333 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-17 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 518.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-17 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 518.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Over-the-Counter Monograph Safety, Innovation, and Reform Act of 2018
Title
Over-the-Counter Monograph Safety, Innovation, and Reform Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] |
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] |
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 518. |
2018-07-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6227-6235) |
2018-07-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5333. |
2018-07-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6227-6237) |
2018-07-16 | House | Mr. Latta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-07-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 640. |
2018-07-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-827. |
2018-05-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-03-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2315 (Related) 2018-05-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 413.
HB7328 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB7328 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Received in the Senate.