US SB2306 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Secretary of the Army, acting through the Chief of Engineers, to undertake remediation oversight of the West Lake Landfill located in Bridgeton, Missouri. (Sec. 1) This bill directs the Department of the Army, through the Chief of Engineers, to act as the lead agency with respect to radioactive contamination remediation at the West Lake Landfill in Bridgeton, Missouri. Nothing in this Act affects the site's designation as a Superfund site.
Title
A bill to require the Secretary of the Army, acting through the Chief of Engineers, to undertake remediation oversight of the West Lake Landfill located in Bridgeton, Missouri.
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy. |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-02-03 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S529-530) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S529-530) |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4100 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Subjects
Army Corps of Engineers
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Missouri
Pollution liability
Radioactive wastes and releases
Solid waste and recycling
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Missouri
Pollution liability
Radioactive wastes and releases
Solid waste and recycling