US SB2305 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 256.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 256.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to enhance cybersecurity education.
Title
Cybersecurity Opportunity Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 256. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-59. |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5593 (Related) 2021-10-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.