US SB2256 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Extender Act of 2017 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend various expiring tax deductions, credits, and rules. The bill extends tax credits relating to: Indian employment, railroad track maintenance, mine rescue team training, qualified zone academy bonds, American Samoa economic development, nonbusiness energy property, new fuel cell motor vehicles, two-wheeled plug-in electric vehicles, alternative fuel vehicle refueling property, second generation biofuel producers, biodiesel and renewable diesel, Indian coal facilities, facilities producing energy from renewable resources, energy efficient new homes, and alternative fuels. The bill extends and modifies the tax credits for: residential energy property, investments in energy property, production from advanced nuclear power facilities, and carbon dioxide sequestration. The bill also extends provisions relating to: the tax exclusion for the discharge of principal residence indebtedness; the treatment of mortgage insurance premiums as qualified residence interest; deductions for tuition and related expenses, income attributable to domestic production activities in Puerto Rico, and energy efficient commercial buildings; depreciating or expensing various types of property; timber gains; empowerment zones; the cover over of rum excise taxes to Puerto Rico and the Virgin Islands; sales or dispositions to implement electric restructuring policies for electric utilities; and the oil spill liability trust fund.
Title
Tax Extender Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] |
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1892 (Related) 2018-02-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-123. (TXT | PDF)
HB3761 (Related) 2017-09-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1551 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-264.
HB2010 (Related) 2017-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2091 (Related) 2017-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2543 (Related) 2017-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3683 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4857 (Related) 2018-01-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB122 (Related) 2017-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB666 (Related) 2017-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1535 (Related) 2017-07-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1663 (Related) 2017-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB110 (Related) 2017-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB721 (Related) 2017-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1403 (Related) 2017-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB407 (Related) 2017-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3761 (Related) 2017-09-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1551 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-264.
HB2010 (Related) 2017-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2091 (Related) 2017-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2543 (Related) 2017-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3683 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4857 (Related) 2018-01-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB122 (Related) 2017-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB666 (Related) 2017-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1535 (Related) 2017-07-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1663 (Related) 2017-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB110 (Related) 2017-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB721 (Related) 2017-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1403 (Related) 2017-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB407 (Related) 2017-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2256/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2256/BILLS-115s2256is.pdf |