US SB2249 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-405.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Rio Puerco Watershed Management Program Reauthorization Act of 2017 This bill amends the Omnibus Parks and Public Lands Management Act of 1996 to reauthorize the Rio Puerco Management Committee and the Rio Puerco Watershed Management Program for 10 years from this bill's enactment. Both the committee and the program address the protection and restoration of the Rio Puerco Watershed in New Mexico.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rio Puerco Watershed Management Program Reauthorization Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenateBy Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-405.
2018-11-29SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 689.
2018-11-29SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
2018-10-02SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2018-02-07SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
2017-12-19SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB4968 (Related) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback