US SB2231 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title V of the Social Security Act to support stillbirth prevention and research, and for other purposes.
Title
Maternal and Child Health Stillbirth Prevention Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. J.D. Vance [R-OH] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | House | Held at the desk. |
2023-10-25 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-10-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-09-30 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4895; text: CR S4895) |
2023-09-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4895) |
2023-07-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4581 (Related) 2023-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.