US SB2224 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Empowering Student Borrowers Act
Title
Empowering Student Borrowers Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1429 (Related) 2017-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB5277 (Related) 2018-03-14 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5277 (Related) 2018-03-14 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Education
Financial literacy
Government information and archives
Higher education
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Student aid and college costs
Student records
Financial literacy
Government information and archives
Higher education
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Student aid and college costs
Student records
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2224/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2224/BILLS-115s2224is.pdf |