US SB2218 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
West Fork Fire Station Act of 2017
Title
West Fork Fire Station Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4609 (Same As) 2018-08-01 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-316.
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2218/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2218/BILLS-115s2218is.pdf |