US HB4609 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-01 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-316.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-01 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-316.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
West Fork Fire Station Act of 2017
Title
West Fork Fire Station Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-01 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-316. |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 543. |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-04-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-04-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3321) |
2018-04-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4609. |
2018-04-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3321-3322) |
2018-04-16 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-04-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 477. |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-624. |
2018-03-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-14 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-12-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-12-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-12-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2218 (Same As) 2018-02-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.