US SB2213 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 359.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 359.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Admiral Lloyd R. "Joe" Vasey Pacific War Commemorative Display Establishment Act
Title
Admiral Lloyd R. "Joe" Vasey Pacific War Commemorative Display Establishment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 359. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-215. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4300 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - Became Public Law No: 115-170. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Conflicts and wars
Hawaii
Military facilities and property
Military history
Monuments and memorials
U.S. history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Conflicts and wars
Hawaii
Military facilities and property
Military history
Monuments and memorials
U.S. history
Veterans' organizations and recognition