US HB4300 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 74-16-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Became Public Law No: 115-170.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Admiral Lloyd R. "Joe" Vasey Pacific War Commemorative Display Establishment Act This bill authorizes the Pacific Historic Parks to establish and maintain a commemorative display to honor the members of the U.S. Armed Forces and Allies who served in the Pacific Theater during World War II. Federal funds may not be used to design, procure, prepare, install, or maintain the commemorative display, but the National Park Service may accept and expend contributions of nonfederal funds and resources for such purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Admiral Lloyd R. "Joe" Vasey Pacific War Commemorative Display Establishment Act

Sponsors

Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D]Rep. Rob Bishop [R]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D]Rep. Walter Jones [R]
Rep. Amata Radewagen [D]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D]Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D]
Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R]Rep. Dwight Evans [D]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D]Rep. Mike Thompson [D]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D]Rep. Joe Courtney [D]Rep. Albio Sires [D]
Rep. John Larson [D]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D]Rep. Jim Cooper [D]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D]
Rep. Ami Bera [D]Rep. Ted Lieu [D]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D]Rep. Charlie Crist [D]
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D]Rep. Betty McCollum [D]Rep. James Langevin [D]Rep. Val Demings [D]
Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D]Rep. Richard Nolan [D]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D]Rep. David Cicilline [D]
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D]Rep. Karen Bass [D]Rep. Anthony Brown [D]Rep. Alma Adams [D]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D]Rep. Frank Pallone [D]Rep. Gwen Moore [D]Rep. Lois Frankel [D]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D]Rep. Don Young [R]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D]
Rep. Bill Shuster [R]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D]Rep. Darren Soto [D]
Rep. Terri Sewell [D]Rep. Jim Costa [D]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D]Rep. Donald Payne [D]
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D]Rep. John Lewis [D]Rep. Liz Cheney [R]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I]
Rep. William Keating [D]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D]Rep. Robert Wittman [R]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D]Rep. Paul Cook [R]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D]Rep. Mike Coffman [R]
Rep. Jackie Speier [D]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D]Rep. Doris Matsui [D]Rep. Sam Graves [R]
Rep. Julia Brownley [D]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D]Rep. Brian Higgins [D]Rep. Norma Torres [D]
Rep. Dina Titus [D]Rep. Krysten Sinema [D]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R]Rep. Ro Khanna [D]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D]Rep. Robert Brady [D]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D]Rep. Martha McSally [R]Rep. Tim Walberg [R]Rep. Gene Green [D]
Rep. Jose Serrano [D]Rep. Tom Cole [R]Rep. David Roe [R]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D]Rep. Al Green [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-170.
2018-05-07SenateSigned by President.
2018-04-25SenatePresented to President.
2018-04-24SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-04-23SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2354)
2018-03-21SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 360.
2018-03-21SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-216.
2018-03-08SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2018-02-14SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
2017-12-11SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2017-12-07HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-12-07HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9746)
2017-12-07HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9746)
2017-12-07HouseMr. Bishop (UT) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
2017-12-06HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 332.
2017-12-06HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-450.
2017-11-30HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2017-11-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-11-29HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-11-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-11-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2213 (Same As) 2018-03-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 359.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback