US SB2188 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 540.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 540.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Indian Reorganization Act to apply the Act to all federally recognized Indian tribes, regardless of when the tribe became recognized. (This effectively overrules the Supreme Court's decision in Carcieri v. Salazar, which held that the Secretary of the Interior could not take land into trust for a specified tribe because that tribe had not been federally recognized when the Act was enacted in 1934.) Ratifies and confirms any action taken by the Secretary pursuant to the Act for any Indian tribe that was federally recognized on the date of the action. Directs the Secretary to report to Congress on the effects of Carcieri v. Salazar on Indian tribes and tribal land. Requires the Secretary to publish a list of each Indian tribe and parcel of tribal land affected by that decision in the Federal Register and on the Department of the Interior's website.
Title
A bill to amend the Act of June 18, 1934, to reaffirm the authority of the Secretary of the Interior to take land into trust for Indian tribes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. John Walsh [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 540. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/05/2014 with an amendment. Without written report. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1873) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1872-1873) |
Same As/Similar To
HB666 (Same As) 2013-02-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.