US HB666 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Indian Reorganization Act to apply the Act to all federally recognized Indian tribes, regardless of when any tribe became recognized. (This effectively overrules the Supreme Court's decision in Carcieri v. Salazar, which held that the Secretary of the Interior could not take land into trust for a specified tribe because that tribe had not been under federal jurisdiction when the Act was enacted.) Ratifies and confirms any action taken by the Secretary pursuant to such Act for any Indian tribe that was federally recognized on the date of that action.
Title
To amend the Act of June 18, 1934, to reaffirm the authority of the Secretary of the Interior to take land into trust for Indian tribes.
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Rep. Xavier Becerra [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Donna Christensen [D-VI] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. Eni Faleomavaega [D-AS] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. George Miller [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. James Moran [D-VA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Gloria Negrete McLeod [D-CA] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Nick Rahall [D-WV] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB279 (Related) 2013-01-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
SB2188 (Same As) 2014-08-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 540.
SB2188 (Same As) 2014-08-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 540.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/666/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr666/BILLS-113hr666ih.pdf |