US SB218 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 79.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 79.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Social Security Fraud Prevention Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill prohibits federal departments and agencies from including the Social Security account number of any individual on any document sent by mail unless the department or agency head determines that inclusion of that Social Security number on the document is necessary. Departments and agencies must issue regulations within one year of this bill's enactment that specify the circumstances under which the inclusion of Social Security account numbers on mailed documents is necessary.
Title
Social Security Fraud Prevention Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 79. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 115-62. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB624 (Same As) 2017-09-15 - Became Public Law No: 115-59. (TXT | PDF)
HB1513 (Related) 2017-03-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
HB1513 (Related) 2017-03-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Postal service