US HB1513 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Social Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Social Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Social Security Must Avert Identity Loss (MAIL) Act of 2017 This bill amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act to direct the Social Security Administration to ensure that no document it sends by mail includes a complete Social Security account number unless necessary.
Title
Social Security Must Avert Identity Loss (MAIL) Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] |
Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] |
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] |
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] |
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB624 (Related) 2017-09-15 - Became Public Law No: 115-59. (TXT | PDF)
SB218 (Related) 2017-05-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 79.
SB218 (Related) 2017-05-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 79.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Postal service
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Postal service
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1513/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1513/BILLS-115hr1513ih.pdf |