US SB2102 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-15 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-15 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Acadia National Park Boundary Clarification Act This bill confirms that the boundary of Acadia National Park in Maine includes approximately 1,441 acres of land and interests in the Schoodic Peninsula. The bill ratifies and approves: the acquisition by the United States of such land and interests, effective as of September 26, 2013; and any alteration of such land or interests held or claimed by the United State that occurred after such date. The Department of the Interior may make technical boundary and limited boundary revisions, as appropriate, to the permanent boundaries of the park (including any park property located within the peninsula and Isle Au Haut districts) to resolve issues resulting from causes such as survey error or changed road alignments or to take into account acquisitions or losses of land adjacent to or within the park in any case in which the total acreage of the land to be so acquired or lost is less than 10 acres, subject to specified conditions. Interior shall contribute a specified amount to a regional consortium composed of units of local government on or in the vicinity of Mount Desert Island that was established to improve the management of the disposal and recycling of solid waste. Interior shall reestablish and appoint members to the Acadia National Park Advisory Commission. Certain land in the park that was conveyed by Interior to the town of Tremont, Maine, shall no longer be used exclusively for school purposes, but for public purposes, subject to the conditions that: (1) use of such land shall not degrade or adversely impact the park's resources or values; and (2) such land shall remain in public ownership for recreational, educational, or similar public purposes. Interior shall allow for the traditional harvesting of the marine worms, clams, and other shellfish, and other marine species in accordance with the laws of the state of Maine: (1) within the park's boundaries, and (2) on any land outside of the park in which Interior has or obtains a property interest. Interior shall convey to the town of Bar Harbor a specified parcel of land within the park to be used for a solid waste transfer facility.
Title
Acadia National Park Boundary Clarification Act
Sponsors
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-319. |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 538. |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB763 (Related) 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
HB4266 (Same As) 2018-03-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB257 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
HB4266 (Same As) 2018-03-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB257 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Maine
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Solid waste and recycling
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Maine
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Solid waste and recycling