US HB4266 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Acadia National Park Boundary Clarification Act This bill confirms that the boundary of Acadia National Park in Maine includes approximately 1,441 acres of land and interests in the Schoodic Peninsula. The bill ratifies and approves: the acquisition by the United States of such land and interests, effective as of September 26, 2013; and any alteration of such land or interests held or claimed by the United State that occurred after such date. The Department of the Interior may make technical boundary and limited boundary revisions, as appropriate, to the permanent boundaries of the park (including any park property located within the peninsula and Isle Au Haut districts) to resolve issues resulting from causes such as survey error or changed road alignments or to take into account acquisitions or losses of land adjacent to or within the park in any case in which the total acreage of the land to be so acquired or lost is less than 10 acres, subject to specified conditions. Interior shall contribute a specified amount to a regional consortium composed of units of local government on or in the vicinity of Mount Desert Island that was established to improve the management of the disposal and recycling of solid waste. Interior shall reestablish and appoint members to the Acadia National Park Advisory Commission. Certain land in the park that was conveyed by Interior to the town of Tremont, Maine, shall no longer be used exclusively for school purposes, but for public purposes, subject to the conditions that: (1) use of such land shall not degrade or adversely impact the park's resources or values; and (2) such land shall remain in public ownership for recreational, educational, or similar public purposes. Interior shall allow for the traditional harvesting of the marine worms, clams, and other shellfish, and other marine species in accordance with the laws of the state of Maine: (1) within the park's boundaries, and (2) on any land outside of the park in which Interior has or obtains a property interest. Interior shall convey to the town of Bar Harbor a specified parcel of land within the park to be used for a solid waste transfer facility.
Title
Acadia National Park Boundary Clarification Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-03-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1518) |
2018-03-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4266. |
2018-03-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1518-1520) |
2018-03-13 | House | Mr. Curtis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-01-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 391. |
2018-01-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-526. |
2017-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-12 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-11-15 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-11-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-11-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB763 (Related) 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
SB257 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
SB2102 (Same As) 2018-08-15 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-319.
SB257 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
SB2102 (Same As) 2018-08-15 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-319.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Maine
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Solid waste and recycling
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Maine
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Solid waste and recycling