US SB2076 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-20-2)
Status: Enrolled on December 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
BOLD Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act Building Our Largest Dementia Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to award cooperative agreements: (1) for the establishment or support of national or regional centers of excellence in public health practice in Alzheimer's disease; (2) to state public health departments, Native American tribes, and other entities to promote cognitive functioning, address cognitive impairment and unique aspects of Alzheimer's disease, and help meet the needs of caregivers; (3) for analysis and public reporting of data on the state and national levels regarding cognitive decline, caregiving, and health disparities, and monitoring of objectives on dementia and caregiving in the Department of Health and Human Services' Healthy People 2020 report.
Title
BOLD Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act Building Our Largest Dementia Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-19 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 438 (Y: 361 N: 3 NV: 68 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-12-27 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-12-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 361 - 3 (Roll no. 438). (text: CR H10282-10283) |
2018-12-19 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10314-10315) |
2018-12-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2076. |
2018-12-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10282-10286) |
2018-12-19 | House | Mr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-12-13 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-13 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-13 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7526-7527) |
2018-12-12 | Senate | S.Amdt.4104 Amendment SA 4104 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | S.Amdt.4104 Amendment SA 4104 proposed by Senator Gardner for Senator Collins. (consideration: CR S7527; text: CR S7527) To clarify provisions relating to waivers. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7526-7527) |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 694. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7017-7019) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4256 (Same As) 2017-11-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Aging
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Hospital care
Neurological disorders
Public-private cooperation
Rural conditions and development
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Hospital care
Neurological disorders
Public-private cooperation
Rural conditions and development