US SB1953 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 732.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 732.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tribal Law and Order Reauthorization and Amendments Act of 2017 This bill amends the Indian Law Enforcement Reform Act, the Tribal Law and Order Act of 2010, and other laws to: (1) establish, or reauthorize through FY2022 and revise, various public safety programs and services for Indian communities (e.g., law enforcement, alcohol and substance abuse prevention, and control of illegal narcotics); and (2) modify provisions, and reauthorize through FY2022 various programs, related to Indian youth and juvenile justice.
Title
Tribal Law and Order Reauthorization and Amendments Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 732. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-433. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-329. |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Criminal justice information and records
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Indian social and development programs
Intergovernmental relations
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Native Americans
Smuggling and trafficking
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Criminal justice information and records
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Indian social and development programs
Intergovernmental relations
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Native Americans
Smuggling and trafficking