US SB1952 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes within the executive branch a National Disaster Safety Board to study the underlying causes of disaster-related fatalities and property damage nationwide and make policy recommendations, and authorizes appropriations for the board through FY2025. Specifically, the board shall review and establish the facts, circumstances, and cause or probable cause of the loss of life, human injury, and economic injury due to a natural hazard with 10 or more fatalities. The board shall initiate a review of an incident by monitoring the situation and assessing available facts to determine the appropriate review response without interfering in any ongoing lifesaving and life sustaining efforts underway by other entities; disseminate best practices to develop disaster investigation and review capacity within state, tribal, and local governments; and establish an office to review and make recommendations to mitigate and prevent the loss of life, or human or economic injury, for vulnerable populations. The Government Accountability Office shall audit the programs and expenditures of the board at least once every two years. The bill defines natural hazard to mean a major disaster that is naturally occurring, to include any naturally occurring heat wave, storms, or wildfires, and to exclude a technological disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disaster Learning and Life Saving Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-27SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB3624 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB5532 (Related) 2021-10-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB5118 (Related) 2022-08-02 - Received in the Senate.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback