US SB1942 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-10 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-10 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Savanna's Act This bill requires the Department of Justice (DOJ) to update the online data entry format for federal databases relevant to cases of missing and murdered Indians to include a new data field for users to input the victim's tribal enrollment information or affiliation. In addition, DOJ must: make standardized law enforcement and justice protocols that serve as guidelines for law enforcement agencies with respect to missing and murdered Indians, develop protocols to investigate those cases that are guided by the standardized protocols, meet certain requirements to consult with Indian tribes, and provide tribes and law enforcement agencies with training and technical assistance relating to the development and implementation of the law enforcement and justice protocols. Federal law enforcement agencies that investigate and prosecute crimes related to missing and murdered Indians must modify their law enforcement and justice protocols to comply with the standardized protocols.
Title
Savanna's Act
Sponsors
Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-10 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-10 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7365-7366; text: CR S7365-7366) |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 715. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-411. |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-329. |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6363-6365) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4485 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB6545 (Related) 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB6545 (Related) 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Indian social and development programs
Intergovernmental relations
Native Americans
Violent crime
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Indian social and development programs
Intergovernmental relations
Native Americans
Violent crime