US HB4485 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Savanna's Act This bill requires the Department of Justice (DOJ) to update the online data entry format for federal databases relevant to cases of missing and murdered Indians to include a new data field for users to input the victim's tribal enrollment information or affiliation. In addition, DOJ must: make standardized law enforcement and justice protocols that serve as guidelines for law enforcement agencies with respect to missing and murdered Indians, develop protocols to investigate those cases that are guided by the standardized protocols, meet certain requirements to consult with Indian tribes, and provide tribes and law enforcement agencies with training and technical assistance relating to the development and implementation of the law enforcement and justice protocols. Federal law enforcement agencies that investigate and prosecute crimes related to missing and murdered Indians must modify their law enforcement and justice protocols to comply with the standardized protocols.
Title
Savanna's Act
Sponsors
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] |
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] |
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-12-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2017-11-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1942 (Same As) 2018-12-10 - Held at the desk.
HB6545 (Related) 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB6545 (Related) 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Indian social and development programs
Intergovernmental relations
Native Americans
Violent crime
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Indian social and development programs
Intergovernmental relations
Native Americans
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4485/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4485/BILLS-115hr4485ih.pdf |