US SB1939 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 335.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to amend title 49, United States Code, to authorize appropriations for the Federal Aviation Administration for fiscal years 2024 through 2028, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access and Dignity for All People Who Travel Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-29SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 335.
2024-02-29SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2024-02-08SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2023-06-13SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB1445 (Related) 2023-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB2558 (Related) 2023-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB2626 (Related) 2023-04-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB3082 (Related) 2023-05-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB3743 (Related) 2023-05-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
SB400 (Related) 2023-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB787 (Related) 2023-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB816 (Related) 2023-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1154 (Related) 2023-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1255 (Related) 2023-04-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1256 (Related) 2023-04-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1438 (Related) 2023-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1459 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1506 (Related) 2023-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1535 (Related) 2023-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1551 (Related) 2023-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1796 (Related) 2023-06-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1883 (Related) 2023-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1914 (Related) 2023-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1929 (Related) 2023-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB4049 (Related) 2023-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB4193 (Related) 2023-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB4446 (Related) 2023-07-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB5356 (Related) 2023-09-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB5355 (Related) 2023-09-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
SB1032 (Related) 2023-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback