US SB1459 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration to issue regulations concerning accommodations for powered wheelchairs, and for other purposes.
Title
MOBILE Act Mobility Aids On Board Improve Lives and Empower All Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3082 (Same As) 2023-05-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
SB1939 (Related) 2024-02-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 335.
HB3935 (Related) 2024-05-16 - Became Public Law No: 118-63.
SB1939 (Related) 2024-02-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 335.
HB3935 (Related) 2024-05-16 - Became Public Law No: 118-63.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/1459/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s1459/BILLS-118s1459is.pdf |