US SB1892 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA), not later than one year after the enactment of this Act, to establish and maintain a registry to be known as the Canadian Forces Base Gagetown Health Registry (Registry) containing the name of each individual who, while serving in the Armed Forces, was stationed at or underwent training at Canadian Forces Base Gagetown, New Brunswick, Canada (Gagetown), during the period beginning on January 1, 1956, and ending on December 31, 2006, and who: (1) applies for care or services from the VA; (2) files a claim for compensation on the basis of any disability that may be associated with such service; (3) dies and is survived by a spouse, child, or parent who files a claim for dependency and indemnity compensation on the basis of such service; (4) requests a health examination from the VA; or (5) receives such examination and requests inclusion in the Registry. Requires the Secretary, upon request, to provide the examination, as well as consultation and counseling regarding examination results to the service member and counseling and consultation to family members of a deceased service member. Directs the Secretary to: (1) notify individuals in the Registry of significant developments in research on the health consequences of potential exposure to a toxic substance or environmental hazard related to service at Gagetown; (2) carry out appropriate outreach activities with respect to such health examinations, consultation, and counseling; (3) provide for a study by an independent entity, not affiiated with the VA, on the potential exposure of individuals to toxic substances or environmental hazards related to service at Gagetown; and (4) submit to the House and Senate Committees on Veterans Affairs an annual report on the Registry.
Title
A bill to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish a registry of certain veterans who were stationed at or underwent training at Canadian Forces Base Gagetown, New Brunswick, Canada, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S9108) |
Same As/Similar To
HB411 (Related) 2013-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1372 (Related) 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB2413 (Related) 2014-06-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB1372 (Related) 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB2413 (Related) 2014-06-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Canada
Congressional oversight
Disability assistance
Environmental health
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military facilities and property
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Canada
Congressional oversight
Disability assistance
Environmental health
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military facilities and property
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/1892/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s1892/BILLS-113s1892is.pdf |