US SB1889 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9107-9108)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9107-9108)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Lands Against Narcotics Trafficking Act of 2013 or the PLANT Act - Amends the Controlled Substances Act to: (1) impose an additional term of up to ten years' imprisonment for cultivating or manufacturing controlled substances on federal property; (2) prohibit a person, while cultivating or manufacturing a controlled substance on federal property, from clear cutting timber or diverting, obstructing, or draining an aquifer, spring, stream, river or body of water; and (3) apply the prohibition against assembling, maintaining, or placing a booby trap on federal property where a controlled substance is being manufactured to federal property where a controlled substance is being cultivated. Directs the U.S. Sentencing Commission to amend and review the Federal Sentencing Guidelines to provide for a penalty enhancement of not less than one offense level for manufacturing, distributing, or dispensing, or possessing with intent to manufacture, distribute, or dispense a controlled substance or a counterfeit substance while on federal property or intentionally trespassing on the property of another if such offense: (1) includes the use of a poison, chemical, or other hazardous substance to cultivate or manufacture controlled substances; (2) creates a hazard to humans, wildlife, or domestic animals; (3) degrades or harms the environment or natural resources; (4) pollutes an aquifer, spring, stream, river, or body of water; (5) involves the diversion, redirection, obstruction, or draining of an aquifer, spring, stream, river, or body of water or the clear cut of timber while cultivating or manufacturing a controlled substance; or (6) involves the possession of a firearm while cultivating or manufacturing controlled substances.
Title
PLANT Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9107-9108) |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S9107) |
Same As/Similar To
HB15 (Related) 2014-03-26 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Garcia. Petition No: 113-9. ( ">Discharge petition text with signatures.)
HB2270 (Related) 2013-07-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB744 (Related) 2014-12-10 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
HB2270 (Related) 2013-07-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB744 (Related) 2014-12-10 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against property
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Firearms and explosives
Forests, forestry, trees
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Lakes and rivers
Land use and conservation
U.S. Sentencing Commission
Water quality
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against property
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Firearms and explosives
Forests, forestry, trees
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Lakes and rivers
Land use and conservation
U.S. Sentencing Commission
Water quality
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/1889/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s1889/BILLS-113s1889is.pdf |