US SB1881 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 371.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 371.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize and amend the Nicaraguan Investment Conditionality Act of 2018 and the Reinforcing Nicaragua's Adherence to Conditions for Electoral Reform Act of 2021, and for other purposes.
Title
Restoring Sovereignty and Human Rights in Nicaragua Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 371. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Cardin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6954 (Related) 2024-12-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.