US SB188 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Became Public Law No: 115-158.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

EGO Act Eliminating Government-funded Oil-painting Act (Sec. 2) This bill prohibits the use of funds appropriated or otherwise made available to the federal government to pay for an official portrait of an officer or employee of the federal government, including the President, the Vice President, a Member of Congress, the head of an executive agency, or the head of an office of the legislative branch.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EGO Act Eliminating Government-funded Oil-painting Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseBecame Public Law No: 115-158.
2018-03-27HouseSigned by President.
2018-03-19HousePresented to President.
2018-03-15HouseMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-03-14HouseSenate agreed to the House amendments to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1738-1739)
2018-03-07HouseMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
2018-03-06HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2018-03-06HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-03-06HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1418)
2018-03-06HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 188.
2018-03-06HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1418-1419)
2018-03-06HouseMr. Blum moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-09-21HouseHeld at the desk.
2017-09-21HouseReceived in the House.
2017-09-19SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2017-09-18SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5810; text: CR S5810)
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 37.
2017-04-24SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-28.
2017-03-15SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2017-01-23SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB1701 (Same As) 2018-01-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 381.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback