US HB1701 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 381.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 381.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EGO Act Eliminating Government-funded Oil-painting Act (Sec. 2) This bill prohibits the use of funds appropriated or otherwise made available to the federal government to pay for an official portrait of an officer or employee of the federal government, including the President, the Vice President, a Member of Congress, the head of an executive agency, or the head of an office of the legislative branch.
Title
EGO Act Eliminating Government-funded Oil-painting Act
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Jim Bridenstine [R-OK] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] |
Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] | Rep. Dave Brat [R-VA] | Rep. Steve Russell [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 381. |
2018-01-11 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2018-01-11 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-511, Part I. |
2017-09-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-09-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB188 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - Became Public Law No: 115-158. (TXT | PDF)
HB6640 (Related) 2018-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
HB6640 (Related) 2018-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Subjects
Appropriations
Art, artists, authorship
Congressional officers and employees
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Art, artists, authorship
Congressional officers and employees
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents