US SB1857 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-422. Minority views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-422. Minority views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish a compliance deadline of May 15, 2023, for Step 2 emissions standards for new residential wood heaters, new residential hydronic heaters, and forced-air furnaces. This bill delays by three years the date by which manufacturers, owners, and operators of new residential wood heaters, including residential hydronic heaters (wood-fired boilers) and forced-air furnaces, must comply with emission standards promulgated under the Clean Air Act.
Title
A bill to establish a compliance deadline of May 15, 2023, for Step 2 emissions standards for new residential wood heaters, new residential hydronic heaters, and forced-air furnaces.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Richard Shelby [R-AL] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | Senate | By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-422. Minority views filed. |
2018-09-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 579. |
2018-09-18 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-09-18 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works Senate Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-127. |
2017-09-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB453 (Related) 2018-01-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 378.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Lighting and heating
Air quality
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Lighting and heating