US SB1855 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-07-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 184.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-07-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 184.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize the Special Diabetes Program for Type 1 Diabetes and the Special Diabetes Program for Indians.
Title
Special Diabetes Program Reauthorization Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 184. |
2023-07-27 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Sanders without amendment. Without written report. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2008-2009) |
Same As/Similar To
HB5378 (Related) 2023-12-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.