US SB1852 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to ensure health insurance coverage continuity for former foster youth. This bill amends title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act to make technical revisions indicating that medical assistance is available to former foster care children regardless of whether they move between states.
Title
A bill to amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to ensure health insurance coverage continuity for former foster youth.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB919 (Related) 2015-02-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3641 (Same As) 2015-10-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB473 (Related) 2015-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3641 (Same As) 2015-10-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB473 (Related) 2015-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/1852/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s1852/BILLS-114s1852is.pdf |