US SB1828 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Specifically authorizes the Central Intelligence Agency, the Department of State, and other agencies to provide payments to agency personnel who incur brain injuries from hostilities while on assignment. Specifically, the bill allows agency personnel and their families to receive payments for brain injuries that are incurred (1) during a period of assignment to a foreign or domestic duty station; (2) in connection with war, insurgency, hostile acts, terrorist activity, or other agency-designated incidents; and (3) not as the result of willful misconduct. The bill's authority applies to injuries incurred before, on, or after the date of the bill's enactment. Agencies must submit classified reports on the bill's implementation, including the number of payments made and the amount of each payment. Since 2016, some intelligence, diplomatic, and other governmental personnel have reported experiencing unusual cognitive and neurological impairments while on assignment (particularly abroad), the source of which is currently under investigation. Symptoms were first reported by personnel stationed in Cuba and have since been collectively referred to as Havana Syndrome.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HAVANA Act of 2021 Helping American Victims Afflicted by Neurological Attacks Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-26HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-07-26HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1828.
2021-07-26HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3854-3857; text: CR H3854-3855)
2021-07-26HouseMr. Castro (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-06-11HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-06-11HouseReceived in the House.
2021-06-08SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-06-07SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3963-3965)
2021-06-07SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3963-3965)
2021-05-25SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

SB1714 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2784)
HB3356 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback