US SB1817 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 23, United States Code, to establish a competitive grant program to repair, improve, rehabilitate, or replace bridges to improve the safety, efficiency, and reliability of the movement of people and freight over bridge crossings, and for other purposes.
Title
Bridge Investment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1931 (Related) 2021-10-06 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 117-41.
SB1953 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB1953 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1817/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1817/BILLS-117s1817is.pdf |