US SB180 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 257.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 257.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to withdraw certain Bureau of Land Management land from mineral development.
Title
Buffalo Tract Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 257. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin without amendment. With written report No. 117-60. |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5805 (Same As) 2022-07-19 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.