US SB1751 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 173.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 173.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Taxpayers From ACORN Act - Prohibits the federal government from awarding contracts, grants, or other agreements to, providing directly or indirectly any other federal funds to, or engaging in activities that promote the Association of Community Organizations for Reform Now (ACORN), an ACORN-related affiliate, or any organization which has a pending indictment for or has been convicted of a violation under federal or state law governing the financing of a campaign for an election for public office or the administration of such an election, including voter registration. Requires the Federal Acquisition Regulation to be revised to carry out provisions of this Act relating to contracts.
Title
Protect Taxpayers From ACORN Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Johanns [R-NE] | Sen. Benjamin Nelson [D-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-06 | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 173. | |
2009-10-05 | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3571 (Related) 2009-10-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement.
HB4444 (Related) 2010-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement.
SB1687 (Related) 2009-09-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 162.
HB4444 (Related) 2010-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement.
SB1687 (Related) 2009-09-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 162.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Community life and organization
Public contracts and procurement
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/1751/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s1751/BILLS-111s1751pcs.pdf |