US SB1687 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 162.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 162.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Taxpayers From ACORN Act - Prohibits any federal contract, grant, cooperative agreement, or other form of agreement from being awarded to, any federal funds in any other form from being provided to, or any federal employee or contractor from promoting, the Association of Community Organizations for Reform Now (ACORN) and any ACORN-related affiliate.Requires the Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council to amend the Federal Acquisition Regulation to carry out provisions of this Act relating to contracts.
Title
Protect Taxpayers From ACORN Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Robert Bennett [R-UT] | Sen. Sam Brownback [R-KS] | Sen. Jim Bunning [R-KY] |
Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Saxby Chambliss [R-GA] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Jim DeMint [R-SC] |
Sen. John Ensign [R-NV] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Judd Gregg [R-NH] |
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Kay Hutchison [R-TX] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
Sen. Mike Johanns [R-NE] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Richard Shelby [R-AL] |
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] | Sen. George Voinovich [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-21 | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 162. | |
2009-09-17 | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3571 (Related) 2009-10-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement.
HB4444 (Related) 2010-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement.
SB1751 (Related) 2009-10-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 173.
HB4444 (Related) 2010-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement.
SB1751 (Related) 2009-10-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 173.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Community life and organization
Public contracts and procurement
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/1687/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s1687/BILLS-111s1687pcs.pdf |