US SB1725 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-25 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-25 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to grant a Federal charter to the National American Indian Veterans, Incorporated.
Title
A bill to grant a Federal charter to the National American Indian Veterans, Incorporated.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-25 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-11-25 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-11-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-11-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6761-6762) |
2022-11-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6760-6762) |
2022-11-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6402 (Same As) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.