US SB1719 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 529.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 529.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wasatch-Cache National Forest Land Conveyance Act of 2010 - Directs the Secretary of Agriculture to convey to the town of Alta, Utah, all interests of the United States in and to specified parcels of National Forest System land in the Wasatch-Cache National Forest in Salt Lake County, Utah. Requires the town to use the land conveyed under this Act for public purposes. Instructs that such conveyance be executed by quitclaim deed and provides for the reversion of the federal land, at the election of the Secretary, if it is used for a purpose other than a public purpose. Requires the boundaries of the conveyed federal land to be determined by the Secretary, in consultation with the Town, subject to the condition that such land not exceed a total of two acres. Requires the town to pay the administrative costs of such conveyance.
Title
Wasatch-Cache National Forest Land Conveyance Act of 2010
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Bennett [R-UT] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-05 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 529. | |
2010-08-05 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 111-259. | |
2010-06-21 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. | |
2009-12-17 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Forests. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 111-364. | |
2009-09-25 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |