US SB171 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 259.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 259.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Commissioned Officer Corps Amendments and Hydrographic Services Improvement Act Reauthorization and Amendments Act of 2017 This bill revises the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Commissioned Officer Corps Act of 2002. The bill sets forth new requirements under that Act concerning obligated service requirements, training and physical fitness, education loan assistance, recruitment, hiring and promotions, and other workforce issues. Additionally, the bill revises and reauthorizes through FY2021 the Hydrographic Services Improvement Act of 1998. The National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration may waive bond requirements for certain contracts regarding vessels that conduct surveying.
Title
National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Commissioned Officer Corps Amendments and Hydrographic Services Improvement Act Reauthorization and Amendments Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 259. |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-181. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB221 (Related) 2018-06-26 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 487.
Subjects
Atmospheric science and weather
Department of Commerce
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Higher education
Hydrology and hydrography
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Military personnel and dependents
National symbols
Physical fitness and lifestyle
Science, technology, communications
Student aid and college costs
Department of Commerce
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Higher education
Hydrology and hydrography
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Military personnel and dependents
National symbols
Physical fitness and lifestyle
Science, technology, communications
Student aid and college costs