US HB221 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-26 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 487.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-26 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 487.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hydrographic Services Improvement Amendments Act (Sec. 2) This bill reauthorizes through FY2023 the Hydrographic Services Improvement Act of 1998. (Sec. 3) The Governmental Accountability Office must compare the unit costs of hydrographic surveys conducted by the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to the unit costs of procuring the surveys.
Title
Hydrographic Services Improvement Amendments Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 487. |
2018-06-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5590-5591) |
2018-06-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 221. |
2018-06-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5590-5591) |
2018-06-25 | House | Mr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-06-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 571. |
2018-06-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-736. |
2018-05-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-05-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-08 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2017-11-02 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB171 (Related) 2017-11-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 259.
SB140 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 115-282.
SB140 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 115-282.
Subjects
Arctic and polar regions
Arctic Ocean
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Hydrology and hydrography
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Public lands and natural resources
Arctic Ocean
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Hydrology and hydrography
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Public lands and natural resources