US SB1689 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Sexual Assault Prevention Act of 2011 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to develop and implement, by February 1, 2012, a centralized and comprehensive policy on reporting and tracking sexual assaults and other safety incidents at each medical facility of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), including: (1) risk-assessment tools; (2) mandatory security training; (3) physical security precautions (surveillance camera systems and panic alarm systems); (4) criteria and guidance for employees communicating and reporting incidents to specified supervisory personnel, VA law enforcement officials, and the Office of Inspector General; (4) an oversight system within the Veterans Health Administration; (5) procedures for VA law enforcement officials investigating, tracking, and closing reported incidents; and (6) clinical guidance for treating sexual assaults reported over 72 hours after assault. Requires the Secretary to: (1) submit an annual report to Congress on such incidents and policy implementation, and (2) prescribe applicable regulations. Repeals required annual reports concerning registered nurse staffing at VA health care facilities.
Title
Veterans Sexual Assault Prevention Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2074 (Related) 2011-10-11 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
HB1627 (Related) 2012-08-06 - Became Public Law No: 112-154.
HB1627 (Related) 2012-08-06 - Became Public Law No: 112-154.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government information and archives
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Nursing
Sex offenses
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government information and archives
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Nursing
Sex offenses
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/1689/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s1689/BILLS-112s1689is.pdf |