US SB1685 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 221.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 221.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish a program for the capture of carbon dioxide produced during the generation of natural gas-generated power. Specifically, DOE must identify opportunities to accelerate the development of commercially viable carbon capture technologies to reduce carbon dioxide emissions; enter into cooperative agreements with certain entities to license, permit, construct, and operate at least three facilities to capture carbon dioxide from natural gas generating power facilities; and identify any barriers to the commercial development of carbon capture technologies.
Title
Launching Energy Advancement and Development through Innovations for Natural Gas Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 221. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-118. |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3828 (Related) 2019-07-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Subjects
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy research
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Oil and gas
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology transfer and commercialization
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy research
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Oil and gas
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology transfer and commercialization