US SB1669 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 208.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to require the Secretary of Transportation to issue a rule requiring access to AM broadcast stations in motor vehicles, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AM Radio for Every Vehicle Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-12SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 208.
2023-09-12SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2023-07-27SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2023-05-17SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB3413 (Same As) 2023-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback